Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hammie, Arnold D., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryProbate-Will & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 11/03/2021
Date: October 12, 2021Response from State Department of Health Services Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Will Dated February 18, 2014 Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Proof of Publication As to Robert D. Hammie Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Pending Proceeding Filed
Date: September 17, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.