Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hill, Katrina, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2022 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00First Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on 5/05/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Katrina Hill
Date: September 21, 2021Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Probate 05/18/2022 03:30 PM D- 201
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Katrina Hill
Date: September 24, 2021Proof of Publication As to Katrina Hill Filed
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Letter re Return Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Petition for Full Authority Filed by Katrina Hill
Date: September 21, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Madeline Brady Filed
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Bond Filed for Petitioner
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Letter re Return of Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.