Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morris, Edward S, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Andrew A. Steckler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2016 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time369 days |
Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate , 2/24/2016
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Filed
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Edward S Morris
Date: December 12, 2016Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: January 13, 2017Examiner's Notes: Distribution Hearing 1/17/17
Date: January 12, 2017Proposed Order Received
Date: December 12, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 17, 2017Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Decree Final Distribution Filed
Date: January 17, 2017Declaration in Response to Probate Examiner's Notes Filed
Date: January 13, 2017Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Edward S Morris
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.