Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boone, Lynne Marie, Bandle, Leslie Caron, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2015 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time1337 days |
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian , 5/22/2015
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Court Investigator Account Checksheet - Notes CI reviewed status report, no issues.
Date: December 30, 2016Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian , 7/24/2015
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.