We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Anderson, Robert ,
filed a(n)
General Probate -
Probate
case
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Filing Date
August 08, 2014
Category
Compromise Of Minor'S Claim
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
General Probate
Case Events for
Anderson, Robert v.
Date
Type
Description
October 23, 2014
Docket Event
Probate Hearing Dropped from dept: 201 date: 10/24/2014 time: 11:00 AM
October 21, 2014
Docket Event
Dropped compliance hearing on 10/24/14 - receipt filed.
October 09, 2014
Docket Event
Receipt/Acknowledgement of Deposit Per Court Order Filed
September 09, 2014
Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim
Judge: Sandra K. Bean
September 09, 2014
Docket Event
Minor's Compromise Hearing Commenced and Completed
September 09, 2014
Docket Event
Probate 10/24/2014 11:00 AM D- 201
September 09, 2014
Docket Event
Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Granted
September 09, 2014
Docket Event
Order Minor's Compromise Filed
September 04, 2014
Docket Event
Examiner's Notes re MINOR'S COMP ON 9/9/14
Get Document
August 08, 2014
Docket Event
Probate 09/09/2014 11:05 AM D- 201
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.