Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lacy, Charlesetta, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2014 |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Filed | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Guardianship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Paternity Filed | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential CONFIDENTIAL TO JUDGE REGARDING CHILD PROTECTIVE SERVICES INFORMATION | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential CONFIDENTIAL TO JUDGE REGARDING CHILD PROTECTIVE SERVICES INFORMATION | |
August 14, 2014 |
Petition for Temporary Guardianship - Person
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 10/21/2014 09:00 AM D- 303 | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Temporary Guardianship - Person Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.