Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Jessica W., Sanchez, Jonathan Y., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time454 days |
Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Waiver of Bond Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Waiver of Account Jonathan Y. Sanchez Filed by Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez
Date: September 04, 2015Waiver of Account Jessica w. Sanchez Filed by Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Independent Admin of Estate - Consent Filed
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Declaration of Jessica W. Sanches Filed
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Second Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Waiver of Notice-Jessica W. Sanchez Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Waiver of Notice-Jonathan Y. Sanchez Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez Filed
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Proposed Action Independent Admin of Estate - Consent
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on for 09/29/2014
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Declaration of Jonathan Y. Sanches Filed
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Creditor's Claims PG&E Company Filed
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00First Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez Filed
Date: 2014-11-21T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final) on for 11/2/15
Date: October 28, 2015Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 02, 2015Declaration that Heirs Are not Currently Incarcerated and Has Never Been Incarcerated Filed
Date: October 30, 2015Order Approving Final Distribution - Waiver of Accounting Filed
Date: November 02, 2015Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Jonathan Y. Sanchez, Jessica W. Sanchez
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: October 14, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.