Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Matter of Laurie Ann Wolfe
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Spousal Property
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Spousal Property
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 |
Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree Final Distribution Filed | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Distribution Approved | |
November 18, 2020 |
Judge: Petition for Final Distribution |
||
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes: Distribution on 11/18/2020 |
|
October 05, 2020 |
Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 11/18/2020 time: 01:30 PM | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Clare Springs in Support of First & Final Account Filed |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration in Support of First & Final Account Filed |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes: Distribution on 10/05/2020 |
|
September 02, 2020 |
Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration in Support of First & Final Account and Report Filed |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 10/05/2020 time: 01:30 PM | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
|
September 02, 2020 |
Judge: Petition for Final Distribution |
||
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final)--Hearing on 9/2/20 |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Brent Martin |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate 09/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 201 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Brent Martin |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
August 20, 2019 |
Review
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Brent Martin |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Bond Filed for Petitioner |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal :: SUPPLEMENTAL Filed |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Probate 08/20/2019 11:00 AM D- 201 |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Increasing Bond Filed |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Increase Bond Granted |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Increase Bond Filed for Brent Martin |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal Reappraisal for Sale Filed |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Dropped from dept: 201 date: 04/19/2019 time: 11:00 AM | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Dropped : compliance hearing on 4/19/19 - Status Report filed 4/3/19 | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Brent Martin |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 04/19/2019 11:00 AM D- 201 | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed |
|
April 20, 2018 |
Status Report
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 10/19/2018 time: 11:00 AM | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Brent Martin |
|
June 30, 2017 |
Status Report
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 04/20/2018 time: 11:00 AM | |
March 01, 2017 |
Petition for
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Upon Hearing of Report on Status of Administration Filed |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Granted | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Tentative Pregrant - Hearing 3/1/17; compliance hrg 6/30/17 @ 11:00 | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Probate 06/30/2017 11:00 AM D- 201 |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Report on Status of Admin 3/1/17 |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph Bontempo Jr. |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Probate 01/24/2017 09:31 AM D- 201 | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 03/01/2017 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Report on Status of Administration Filed by Brent Martin |
|
June 14, 2016 |
Status Report of Administration - PC 12200
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Status Report of Administration - PC 12200 Granted | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Upon Hearing of Report on Status of Administration Filed |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Tentative Pregrant - of Status of Administration on for 06/14/2016 | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Report on Status of Administration on for 06/14/2016 |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Brent Martin |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Receipt of Notice and Authorization to Receive Notice Filed |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 06/14/2016 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Report on Status of Administration on for 04/27/2016 |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph Bontempo Jr. |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 04/27/2016 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph Bontempo Jr. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Probate 04/12/2016 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Status Report of Administration - PC 12200 Filed by Brent Martin |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Special Notice Filed for Third Party |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Consent Filed |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action Filed |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claims Allowed for $5,000.00 for Christopher Kerns Filed |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claims from Christopher Kerns in the amount of $5,000.00. Filed |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters of Administration Filed |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Bond Filed for Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2015 |
Petition for
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Administrator Brent Martin Filed |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrator Appointed Brent Martin | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Pregrant - ON 2/2/15 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration of Attorney for Petitioner: Response to Examiner's Notes on Petition Filed |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication As to Joseph Bontempo Jr. Filed |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters of Special Administration Filed |
|
December 02, 2014 |
Petition for
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 02/02/2015 time: 09:30 AM | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Administrator Brent Martin Filed |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate ON 12/2/14 |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication As to Brent Martin Filed |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters of Special Administration Filed |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Bond Filed for Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition Re: Petition for Letters of Special Administration without Powers Granted |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Administrator Filed |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration of Clare H. Springs Filed |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination of Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of AdministratorChr |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declinaton to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Administrator of |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Special Adm.-C.K |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Letters of Administration Filed by Joseph Bontempo Jr. |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with the Consent to Nomination of Administrator -S |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Special Adm.-Sam |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Conset to Nomination of Administrator of |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Special Adm-Kevi |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Probate 12/02/2014 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Administrator of |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Special Adm-Elsi |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition Re: Petition for Letters of Special Administration without Powers Filed for Joseph Bontempo |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous /Declination to Act and Concurrence with and Consent to Nomination of Special Adm.-Val |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities Filed | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Dropped from dept: 201 date: 09/23/2014 time: 09:30 AM | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes: Spousal Property Petition , 9/23/14 |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Probate 09/23/2014 09:30 AM D- 201 | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Petition Filed |
|