Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boatman, Clevon Gewanda, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryProbate-Will & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time594 days |
Examiner's Notes: Distribution on 8/26/14
Date: August 19, 2014Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate , 3/20/13
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate , 2/13/13
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Letters of Testamentary Filed
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action Filed by Clevon Gewanda Boatman
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: August 20, 2014First Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Waiver of Account Clevon Gewanda Boatman Filed by Clevon Gewanda Boatman
Date: June 30, 2014Proof of Publication As to Clevon Gewanda Boatman Filed
Date: 2013-01-31T00:00:00Declaration of petitioner Filed
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: 2013-01-09T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 26, 2014Order Appointing Executor Filed
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Will Dated 29th Day of July, 2005 Filed
Date: 2013-01-09T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Clevon Gewanda Boatman
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Response to Examiners Notes Re: Procedural Errors and Omissions Filed
Date: August 21, 2014Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Clevon Gewanda Boatman
Date: August 20, 2014Order Approving Final Distribution - Waiver of Accounting Filed
Date: August 26, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.