Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson & Kennard, against Thea Airrington, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions349 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3999 days |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/31/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AND FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THEA AIRRINGTON FILED
Date: 2009-04-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/28/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 02.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR ALL PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00NON SERVICE/RETURN SUMMONS AS TO THEA AIRRINGTON
Date: 2009-04-21T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 12/15/09
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: 2010-01-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $916.65 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $111.00 FILED.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $327.86 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $51.00 FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: May 13, 2019NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: May 13, 2019WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LA COUNTY
Date: 2010-12-15T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2012-08-14T00:00:00FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: August 14, 2015ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT BY ASSIGNEE LVNV FUNDING LLC FILED
Date: May 13, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.