Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Robert Nash Iii, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3834 days |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION
Date: December 31, 2008LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: August 24, 2009SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/31/2008 OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. AND FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/30/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 07/02/09
Date: July 02, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.