Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arturo Ortiz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Salvador Arana Gonzalez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with John D. Molloy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Molloy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract-Over $10K/Under $25K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions621 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/08/09 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY ARTURO ORTIZ.
Date: 2010-12-13T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 02/09/11
Date: February 09, 2011NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN D. MOLLOY IN DEPARTMENT 04
Date: 2010-02-03T00:00:00DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES; INTEREST AND COSTS FILED
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: ENTRY OF DEFAULT CLERKS JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY ARTURO ORTIZ.
Date: 2009-05-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ARTURO ORTIZ AND FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY ARTURO ORTIZ.
Date: 2009-01-20T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR SETTING SUBMITTED BY ARTURO ORTIZ.
Date: 2010-08-11T00:00:00HEARING SET 8/01/11 AT 9:00 IN DEPARTMENT 02
Date: June 22, 2011MINUTE ORDER: COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: 2010-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.