Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fcp General Contracting Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thompson & Colegate, against David Bauer, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time659 days |
NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/02/09 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: December 31, 2008DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CMS FAX FILED BY THOMPSON & COLEGATE
Date: June 16, 2009CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FCP GENERAL CONTRACTING INC
Date: June 16, 2009REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: June 25, 2009SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF FCP GENERAL CONTRACTING INC AND FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.