Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Riley Electric Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Barry S Mason, against Guthrie-Leach Llc, Jim Guthrie Construction Inc, represented by Best, Best, & Krieger, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1398 days |
Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed
Date: 2012-09-24T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2009-12-11T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC filed.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Declaration of OF RANDAL P HANNAH IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: CDONSOLIDATION AND DISMISSAL filed
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC filed.
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC filed.
Date: 2012-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement by RILEY ELECTRIC INC filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement by RILEY ELECTRIC INC filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of RILEY ELECTRIC INC and filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00Notice OF RELATED CASE by JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC filed.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY RILEY ELECTRIC INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF RANDAL P HANNAH IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: CDONSOLIDATION AND DISMISSAL FILED
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY RILEY ELECTRIC INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/06/09 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF RILEY ELECTRIC INC AND FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC FILED.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC FILED.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC FILED.
Date: 2012-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC FILED.
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: 2012-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE BY JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC FILED.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
OSC Hearing re: Why Related Cases Should Not Be Consolidated as to RILEY ELECTRIC INC, JIM GUTHRIE CONSTRUCTION INC, GUTHRIE-LEACH LLC. Hearing Off-Calendar |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause hearing why Dismissal on the RILEY ELECTRIC INC should not be ordered unless Plaintiff/X-Plaintiff seeks relief from Stay of Bankruptcy prior to 12/11/09 Continued |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Complete |
|
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Status Conference Vacated |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Status Conference Continued |
|
September 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Status Conference Continued |
|
June 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Continued |
|
April 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause hearing why Dismissal on the RILEY ELECTRIC INC should not be ordered unless Plaintiff/X-Plaintiff seeks relief from Stay of Bankruptcy prior to 12/11/09 Hearing Off-Calendar |
|
April 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Status Conference Continued |
|
March 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Status Conference Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.