Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bidna & Keys, against Maria G Anderson, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions361 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1687 days |
DECLARATION OF OF LOST SUMMONS AFTER SERVICE FILED
Date: October 20, 2006REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: October 20, 2006NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/28/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.
Date: 2006-09-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: December 05, 2006REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2005 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED.
Date: October 20, 2006DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMT FILED
Date: 2006-10-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK
Date: 2006-08-16T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT/CT JUDGMT PKG RCVDD 8/15/06 SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: 2006-08-16T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: 2006-05-22T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.
Date: November 20, 2006REJECTED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT/CT JUDGMT PKG RCVD 9/8/06 SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: 2006-09-12T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING
Date: December 13, 2006REJECTED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT/CT JUDGMT PKG RCVD 8/15/06 SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: 2006-08-16T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE INTEREST FILED
Date: 2006-10-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 12/26/06
Date: December 26, 2006REJECTED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT/CT JUDGMT PKG RCVD 9/27/06 SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: 2006-09-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.