Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maryhellen Richey, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jones, Keith A., against Hennmar, Llc, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Commercial) Under $10K (Mv)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1687 days |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: December 30, 2005JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/13/06
Date: March 13, 2006REJECTED DOCUMENT: DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY MARYHELLEN RICHEY.
Date: May 20, 2006LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: December 30, 2005ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/15/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 11
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: January 23, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.