Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ff Properties Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & St. John, against Reggie Miranda, Sarah Margaret Mackie, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Mark E. Petersen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Petersen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Mv)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time4046 days |
DECLARATION OF FOR USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF LOST ORIGINALS FILED
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER ROBERT W NAGBY.
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $872.38 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: 2010-04-16T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $2,019.21 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $110.00 FILED.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 01/13/06
Date: 2006-01-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY FF PROPERTIES LP FILED
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2010-04-16T00:00:00FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET 1/14/14 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. MV1UD
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00COPY OF THE CLAIM EXEMPTION RECEIVED FROM THE RIVERSIDE SHERIFF'S OFFICE.
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1,260.39 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $55.00 FILED.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY FF PROPERTIES LP FILED.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORA COUNTY
Date: 2011-06-07T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS - BY FF PROPERTIES LP FILED.
Date: 2010-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00$3140.23 AS TO SARAH MARGARET MACKIE ONLY
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/14/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 11
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1,878.98 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $110.00 FILED.
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2006-01-13T00:00:00PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2010-04-16T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY SARAH MARGARET MACKIE
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2006-02-02T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).
Date: 2006-01-13T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2006-01-13T00:00:00VERIFICATION
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: June 05, 2015WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; ORANGE COUNTY
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: June 11, 2015DECLARATION OF KAREEM M KHALIDY FILED
Date: September 08, 2016FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: January 27, 2017RETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT OF EXECUTION SUBMITTED BY FF PROPERTIES LP.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: September 08, 2016ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: September 08, 2016--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1,442.24 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $285.00 FILED.
Date: September 08, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.