Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
National Credit Acceptance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of John J Pugh, against Sylvia Belman, Heribert Belman, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Thomas H. Cahraman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas H. Cahraman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions375 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1686 days |
NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/22/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF ANTHONY SPENCER FILED
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2005 OF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC
Date: 2006-08-14T00:00:00DECLARATION OF WAIVING EXCESS ATTYS FEES PRAYED FOR IN COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00DECLARATION OF FOR LOST ORIGINAL DOC FILED
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00DECLARATION OF FOR JUDGMT BY COURT AND LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED
Date: 2006-09-01T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: February 20, 2007JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 01/03/07
Date: January 09, 2007MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: July 12, 2007ORDER FOR LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE THOMAS H. CAHRAMAN.
Date: 2007-01-09T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $2,697.52.
Date: February 15, 2008WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; SACRAMENTO COUNTY
Date: February 08, 2008WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SAC COUNTY
Date: August 17, 2007--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $0.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $451.00 FILED.
Date: February 15, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.