Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kasel Enterprises, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siegel & Siegel, against California Metal Products, Inc., Service Managementgroup Inc, Smg, Inc., represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions332 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1686 days |
REMOVE FROM THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF KASEL ENTERPRISES THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) 0003
Date: 2006-06-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF KASEL ENTERPRISES
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF KASEL ENTERPRISES RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE REQUEST TO VACATE OSC FILED
Date: 2006-08-04T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT CLERKS JUDGMENT (RECD 07/17/06) SUBMITTED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES.
Date: 2006-10-19T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2005 OF KASEL ENTERPRISES RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY KASEL ENTERPRISES FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)
Date: 2006-06-05T00:00:001ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF KASEL ENTERPRISES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/22/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 5/11/06 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE POSTED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES
Date: 2006-07-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2005 OF KASEL ENTERPRISES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES.
Date: 2006-11-09T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORA COUNTY
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING
Date: 2007-01-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORD/APPEAR AND EXAM AS TO THERESA HOANG FOR CA MET FILED.
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $794.18.
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; ORANGE COUNTY
Date: May 05, 2010REJECTED DOCUMENT: BENCH WARRANT SUBMITTED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES.
Date: May 28, 2008REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 11/27/06
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $46.74 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00LODGED: UNABLE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF BENCH WARRANT/WARRANT.
Date: April 21, 2009BENCH WARRANT ISSUED.
Date: 2008-05-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION BY KASEL ENTERPRISES FILED.
Date: 2008-03-24T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION SET 3/07/08 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07
Date: 2008-01-23T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE:INTEREST CALCULATION FILED
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING
Date: 2008-05-19T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $410.05 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: November 03, 2009WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORA COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: November 03, 2009REJECTED DOCUMENT: JUDGMENT/DECLARATION RE: INEREST CALCULATION SUBMITTED BY KASEL ENTERPRISES.
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1717.5 FILED
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE:EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY KASEL ENTERPRISES FILED.
Date: November 03, 2009DECLARATION OF RE:UNDERYLING ACTION OF OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT FILED
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: November 03, 2009WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORA COUNTY
Date: November 04, 2009CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING
Date: 2008-04-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.