Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Granite State Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Charles B Carey, against D B Gain, Inc., represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Over $10K/Under $25K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions396 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1686 days |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: January 30, 2007DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; UNDERLYING STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED
Date: January 30, 2007NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/21/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2005 OF GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-08-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: 2006-05-23T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: September 18, 2007LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 01/30/07
Date: January 30, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.