Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jurupa Investors Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Gary A. De Perine, against Manuel Gutierrez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Commercial) Under $10K (Mv)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions26 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1686 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/13/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 11
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).
Date: January 25, 2006JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 01/25/06
Date: January 25, 2006REJECTED DOCUMENT: UD COURT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY JURUPA INVESTORS LLC.
Date: March 20, 2006CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: February 10, 2006CLERKS NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE.
Date: 2006-01-13T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00JUDGMENT - CASE DISPOED
Date: 2006-01-25T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2006-01-25T00:00:00PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2005-12-30T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2006-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.