Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bidna & Keys, Aplc, against Eileen E Carl, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions206 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1700 days |
NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/15/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED
Date: March 23, 2006ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED
Date: 2006-01-25T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK.
Date: October 06, 2006DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK
Date: May 11, 2006DECLARATION OF OF ROBERT ADKINS IN SUPP OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGM FILED
Date: March 23, 2006REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2005 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED.
Date: 2006-03-23T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: December 01, 2006DECLARATION OF OF ANGELA R OAKS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMT BY DEFAULT FILED
Date: 2006-03-23T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 07/07/06
Date: July 10, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.