Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris & Zide, against Linda Buhneing, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions383 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1700 days |
DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC
Date: October 12, 2006DECLARATION OF OF FLINT C ZIDE RE WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% AND ATTYS FEES FILED
Date: October 12, 2006CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING
Date: December 11, 2006DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMT FILED
Date: 2006-10-12T00:00:00ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2005 OF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-07-14T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 01/03/07
Date: January 03, 2007DECLARATION OF RE INTEREST CALCULATION FILED
Date: 2006-10-12T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/14/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: January 11, 2007CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.