Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
All American Private Security Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schiada & Caballero, against Nicholaisen & Sons Construction, Inc, Nicholaisen & Sonsconstruction, Inc, represented by Smith Chapman & Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Craig G. Riemer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1733 days |
Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation to Participate in Court Mediation; Acknowledgment of Receipt; Order Thereon filed
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement by ALL AMERICAN PRIVATE SECURITY INC filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 212(g)(1)
Date: 2006-08-17T00:00:00Order for Court mediation is Granted and filed; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00CASE ORDERED TO MEDIATION.
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ALL AMERICAN PRIVATE SECURITY INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)
Date: 2006-08-17T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/09/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY NICHOLAISEN & SONSCONSTRUCTION, INC
Date: 2006-12-05T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF STAY RE BANKRUPTCY SUBMITTED BY NICHOLAISEN & SONSCONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: 2006-11-30T00:00:00STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN COURT MEDIATION; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT; ORDER THEREON FILED
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00MEDIATION HEARING SET 9/22/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 03M
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00ORDER FOR COURT MEDIATION IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.
Date: 2006-08-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on OSC re Dismissal after settlement Complete |
|
October 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Re: Post Mediation Status Conference Entire Case Settled |
|
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Mediation Hearing Hearing Off-Calendar |
|
August 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Complete |
|
July 03, 2020 | Hearing |
OSC Hearing why Sanctions of $150.00 on the Complaint of ALL AMERICAN PRIVATE SECURITY INC as to NICHOLAISEN & SONS CONSTRUCTION, INC should not be ordered for failure to file Proof of Service of Summons Vacated |
|
June 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause hearing why Dismissal on the ALL AMERICAN PRIVATE SECURITY INC should not be ordered unless Plaintiff/X-Plaintiff seeks relief from Stay of Bankruptcy prior to 06/28/07 Dismissed |
|
May 02, 2020 | Hearing |
OSC Hearing why Sanctions of $150.00 on the Complaint of ALL AMERICAN PRIVATE SECURITY INC as to NICHOLAISEN & SONS CONSTRUCTION, INC should not be ordered for failure to file Proof of Service of Summons Continued |
|
March 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Court Trial set 03/02/07, at 10:30, in Dept. 07, time estimate 1 OSC Set |
|
March 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Court Trial set 03/02/07, at 10:30, in Dept. 07, time estimate 1 Continued |
|
February 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Off-Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.