Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris & Zide, against Stephanie Post, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3675 days |
VERFICATION FILED
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 03/28/06
Date: 2006-03-28T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2005 OF PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC FILED.
Date: 2006-03-28T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: January 10, 2007WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: June 04, 2007MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: January 06, 2016ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2005 OF PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC RETURNED AND FILED.
Date: 2006-03-28T00:00:00DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED
Date: January 06, 2016LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/09/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC
Date: 2006-03-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED.
Date: 2006-03-28T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $8,494.27 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: January 06, 2016CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: July 12, 2007WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2006-07-11T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: January 08, 2016DECLARATION OF OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED
Date: June 19, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.