Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bre Properties, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & St. John, against Maria Chaira, Rodrigo Chaira, Rodrigo Hurtado, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Mv)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions306 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1700 days |
STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.
Date: 2006-03-03T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.
Date: 2006-04-03T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: UD COURT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY BRE PROPERTIES, INC..
Date: 2006-01-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/03/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 11
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES 1-10 FILED
Date: 2006-03-20T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.
Date: August 03, 2006NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY BRE PROPERTIES, INC. FILED.
Date: July 27, 2006POINT AND AUTHORITIES RE:NON APPORTIONMENT OF RENT - FILED
Date: 2006-03-20T00:00:00FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERKS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2006-03-20T00:00:00DECLARATION AND WORKSHEET FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.
Date: 2006-03-20T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.
Date: 2006-06-05T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: 2006-07-27T00:00:00REJECTED DOCUMENT: DECLARATION AND U.D.DEFAULT PACKET SUBMITTED BY BRE PROPERTIES, INC..
Date: 2006-05-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.