Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robert R Perkins, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by In Pro Per, Pro Per, against Bank Of America N A, Prober & Raphael Alc, Western Pacific Housing-Norco Estates Llc, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Order of Dismissal
Date: July 21, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: April 29, 2022Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)
Date: April 26, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: March 30, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: April 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 24, 2022Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees filed by ROBERT R PERKINS (Form FW-001).
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: January 24, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92860.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of PERKINS and filed.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.