Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRUIST BANK vs ELLIOTT
An Unlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Irma Poole Asberry presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 05, 2020
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2023
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Unlimited Civil Breach of Contract/Warranty
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of TRUIST BANK |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Proposed Order for Settlement and Retention of Jurisdiction on Complaint of TRUIST BANK |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Within-Firm |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint of TRUIST BANK |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Continuing Case Management Conference, Order Extending Time to Serve |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS on Complaint of TRUIST BANK |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
April 12, 2021 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING | ||
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing |
|
February 11, 2021 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) | ||
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of department assignment for all purposes and Notice of case management confernce. |
|
October 20, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE. Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint of TRUIST BANK and filed. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92509. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside) |
|
October 14, 2020 | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE) | ||
October 14, 2020 |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2020 OF TRUIST BANK AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/11/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER | ||
October 14, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509. Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 |
DECLARATION FILED Not Applicable |
||
August 11, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)as toTRUIST BANK, LIPPMAN RECUPERO Vacated Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
August 11, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)as toTRUIST BANK, LIPPMAN RECUPERO Vacated Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
August 11, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Vacated Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)as toTRUIST BANK, LIPPMAN RECUPERO Continued Hearing Not Held Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)as toTRUIST BANK, LIPPMAN RECUPERO Continued Hearing Not Held Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Continued Judge: Irma Poole Asberry |
|
July 15, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion Completed Judge: Irma Asberry |
|
April 12, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Continued Hearing Not Held |
|
April 12, 2020 | hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING | |
April 05, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion Completed Judge: Irma Asberry |