Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Steel Placers Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gladych Law, Inc, against Zurich American Insurance Company, Riverside Construction Company Inc, Zurich North American Surety, Riverside Construction Companyinc, represented by Thomas Norwood Jacobson, Unrepresented, Law Offices Of Thomas N Jacobson, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Craig G. Riemer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Minute Order: Jury Trial
Date: January 07, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration of Thomas N. Jacobson RE expert witness declaration
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: January 04, 2022Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: July 29, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: July 29, 2021Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 20, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of AMERICAN STEEL PLACERS INC and filed.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.