Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas M Alexander Jr, Thomas M Alexander, Jr, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Alexander Law Offices, Stratton Scott Barbee, against Sally Goodman June, The Yoga Connection, represented by Trachtman & Trachtman Llp, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Carol A. Greene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol A. Greene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management150 days |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
||
Request for Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2022Minute Order: Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Three)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Motion Hearing
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Protective Order by THOMAS M ALEXANDER, JR
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Reply In Support of Request for Protective Order on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Declaration of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order: Jury Trial
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Order from District Court of Appeal (Non Appeal) petition for writ of mandate is DENIED
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for a Protective Order on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Court Ruling (eFiling)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Request to Compel Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Statement of Agreement or Non Agreement
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Amended Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Court Ruling (eFiling)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Supplemental Information to Amended Petition...
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Notice of Motion and Motion for summary judgment
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Remote Settlement Month Mediation Program on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice in support of Opposition
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration of Donald S Zalewski in support of Motion for summary judgment
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M Alexander Jr in support of Opposition
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Index of exhibits in support of Motion for summary judgment
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration of Sally Goodman June in support of Motion for summary judgment
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion for summary judgment
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Separate statement of undisputed facts
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion for summary judgment on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint of ALEXANDER by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Objection to Defendant Sally Goodman's June's Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Opposition to Notice of Notice of Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Motion to Strike for hearing on 11/24/20 submitted by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Declaration of Donald S Zalewski Regarding Meet & Confer About Demurrer Pursuant to CCP 430.41 filed
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of/to Demurrer by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 10/06/20.
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:001st Amended Complaint of ALEXANDER Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 08/13/20.
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of ALEXANDER by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Reply to /ISO deft's mtn to strike punitive damages by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT by THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR filed
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Reply to /ISO deft's demurrer to plaintiff's complaint by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Objection to DEFT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Proposed Order re: DEMIRRER TO COMPLAINT for hearing on 08/13/20 submitted by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE filed.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by THOMAS M ALEXANDER JR
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed.
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 07/15/20.
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of ALEXANDER and filed.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of posting jury fees by SALLY GOODMAN JUNE.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.