Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jimmy Grover, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Superior Court Of Riverside, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Stephen J. Gallon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Minute Order: Writ of Habeas Corpus Correspondence
Date: June 05, 2020Judicial Review and Order Filed.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order and Copy of Correspondence.
Date: June 05, 2020Correspondence (Imaged) Submitted by JIMMY GROVER DATED 10/10/19
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed; Honorable Judge Stephen Gallon.
Date: February 04, 2020Judicial Review and Order Filed.
Date: February 04, 2020Informal Response to Habeas Corpus of GROVER filed by SUPERIOR COURT OF RIVERSIDE (Habeas Corpus).
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Correspondence (Imaged) Submitted by Jimmy Grover
Date: May 11, 2020REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE WRIT RESPONSE
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Proposed Order re Extension of Time Received and Forwarded to S204 (Habeas Corpus)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Denial entered on 02/04/20 filed.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address for Pro/Per representing JIMMY GROVER filed.
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Judicial Review and Order Filed.
Date: June 05, 2020Order re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed; Honorable Judge Stephen Gallon.
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.