Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manuel Barrios, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Steven G. Counelis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryPetn-For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions39 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Cycle Time136 days |
PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00JUDICIAL REVIEW AND ORDER FILED.
Date: September 03, 2019ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE STEVEN G. COUNELIS ( PC 1203.4 .
Date: September 03, 2019CLERK'S CALENDAR REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION TO DISMISS CRIMINAL CASE SET 8/13/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RCLRK.
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY RE: PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: August 20, 20198715A JUS DISPOSITION LODGED BY COURT.
Date: December 09, 2019CCRPDC HEARING SET FOR 08/13/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DA RESPONSE FILED
Date: August 21, 2019CRIMINAL HISTORY RAP SHEET LODGED BY COURT.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED.
Date: December 09, 2019CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 43.
Date: September 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.