Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cesar Hassler, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Liliana Villafuerte, Benjamin Cedano, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time93 days |
CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CESAR HASSLER.
Date: February 14, 2019FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.
Date: April 03, 2019COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/04/19
Date: February 04, 2019APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: February 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/01/19 AT 8:00 IN CLER
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: February 20, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2018 OF CESAR HASSLER AND FILED.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.