Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Interinsurance Exchange Of Theautomobile, Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Richardson, Fair &Cohen, Richardson, Fair & Cohen, against Jasmine Elizabeth Gensler, Jonathan Jacob Gensler, Moriah Elise Cason, represented by In Pro Per, Pro Per, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David E. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions575 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time575 days |
Notice of Department Assignment
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: May 02, 2022Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE
Date: February 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: February 02, 2022Amended Judgment on Complaint of INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE
Date: February 02, 2022Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Trial by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE filed.
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Court Trial - Short Cause
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order on Motion to Deem Admitted Matters; Honorable Commissioner David E. Gregory.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Declaration of SALVADOR CORONA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees filed by JONATHAN JACOB GENSLER (Form FW-001).
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Riverside)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE and filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 07/01/19 AT 08:30IN DEPARTMENT MV1.
Date: 2019-02-02T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY JONATHAN JACOB GENSLER.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRIAL BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE FILED.
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FOR HEARING 10/15/19.
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00ORDER ON MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED MATTERS; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 7/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF.
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 7/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. MV1.
Date: 2019-02-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT MV1
Date: 2019-02-02T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER - RESCHEDULED TO:
Date: 2019-02-02T00:00:00HEARING SET 10/15/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT MV1
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00DECLARATION OF SALVADOR CORONA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR JONATHAN JACOB GENSLER WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER; $395.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JONATHAN JACOB GENSLER (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2018 OF INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE AND FILED.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. MV1.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 7/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2019-02-02T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 10/15/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. MV1 - RES94268
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.