Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Teresa Moran, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryCollection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time675 days |
DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 6/15/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 6/15/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: August 28, 2019JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT MV1.
Date: August 28, 2019RETURNED DOCUMENT: COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.
Date: August 28, 2019DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: 1. INTEREST 2. COSTS (CCP 1033) 3. ATTORNEY FEES FILED
Date: April 11, 2019CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR DEBT-BUYER JUDGMENT REVIEW.
Date: July 15, 2019HEARING RE: OSC RE: SANCTIONS IS RESCHEDULED TO 06/15/20 AT 08:30IN DEPARTMENT MV1.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 6/15/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT MV1.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW SET 8/26/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT DJ03.
Date: July 15, 2019SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: September 09, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.