Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Day Street Owner Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & Stjohn Llp, against Royce Yamaguchi, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Phillip J. Argento presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions8 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time116 days |
COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DAY STREET OWNER LLC.
Date: August 28, 2018DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: October 02, 2018APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW IS SET ON 12/04/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJUD
Date: October 25, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/20/2018 OF DAY STREET OWNER LLC AND FILED.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/19/18 AT 8:00 IN CLER
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/28/18
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: September 04, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: September 21, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: October 02, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.