Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Westlake Services Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Westlake Services Llc, against Anthony Pedro Jr, Lorita H Pedro, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract-Over $10K/Under $25K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions318 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time679 days |
TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 2/06/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. MV1.
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 2/06/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 2/06/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF ARSINE TSATURYAN IN SUPPORT OF ACCRUED INTEREST CALCULATION FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF EDIT ALEXANDRYAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DEFAULT DISMISSAL OR RESPONSIVE PLEADING FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/10/2018 OF WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC AND FILED.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/09/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF ARSINE TSATURYAN IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY PER CCP 585(D) AND 1033 FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW SET 7/08/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT DJMV1.
Date: June 24, 2019SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: June 04, 2019REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: June 19, 2020RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC.
Date: June 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.