Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
John Daciolas Iii, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Helios (Joe) Hernandez II presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 10, 2017 |
CategoryPetn-For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Cycle Time22 days |
RAP SHEET LODGED BY COURT.
Date: October 10, 2017REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY RE: PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: October 24, 2017ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE HELIOS J. HERNANDEZ ( PC 1203.4 .
Date: October 26, 20178715A JUS DISPOSITION FORM LODGED BY COURT.
Date: November 01, 2017MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED.
Date: November 01, 2017PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00CCRPDC HEARING SET FOR 10/25/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DA RESPONSE RECEIVED
Date: October 25, 2017PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.