Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cesar Rogelio Quezada, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Helios (Joe) Hernandez II presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2016 |
CategoryPetn-For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Cycle Time14 days |
HEARING SET 9/28/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 63
Date: September 15, 2016PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: September 15, 2016MANUAL 8715 SENT TO DOJ.
Date: September 29, 2016DEFTS RAPP SHEET LODGED BY COURT - CONFIDENTIAL
Date: September 15, 2016ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE HELIOS J. HERNANDEZ (PC 1203.4/1203.4A).
Date: September 28, 2016MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS CASE PURSUANT TO PENAL CODE SECTIONS 1203.4 BY CESAR ROGELIO QUEZADA FILED
Date: September 15, 2016MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED.
Date: September 29, 2016REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY RE: PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: September 23, 20168715A JUS DISPOSITION FORM LODGED BY COURT.
Date: September 29, 2016PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.