Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Comenity Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mendelson Goldman & Schwarz, against Johnny Bright, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David E. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions165 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1356 days |
MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: November 07, 2016DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 06/20/16
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $127.80 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $25.00 FILED.
Date: November 07, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT 11.
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 1/05/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: November 09, 2016CASE ASSIGNED TO 07 FOR JUDGMENT REVIEW.
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: September 30, 2016DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW SET 6/20/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT DJ07.
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF PLAINTIFFS NAME IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON JOHNNY BRIGHT FILED
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: September 05, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS BY COMENITY BANK FILED.
Date: February 14, 2017ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, JOHNNY BRIGHT FILED.
Date: September 17, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.