Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Otilia Morales, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by United Law One, against Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, First American Title Insurance, Wells Fargo Bank Na, represented by Severson & Werson, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryOther Real Property-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions299 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF OTILIA MORALES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 5/18/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA (ON-LINE RESERVATION).
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 06/16/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07 - RES55592.
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00FIRST PAPER FEE PAID AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA (ON-LINE RESERVATION).
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 07/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07 - RES56885
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/02/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF OTILIA MORALES AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA ATTORNEY SEVERSON & WERSON ADDED.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (COPY) FILED BY OTILIA MORALES.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 03/02/16 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92567.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF OTILIA MORALES.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00DISCLAIMER TO THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF OTILIA MORALES FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CHANGING HEARING(S) SET FOR 6-28-16
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DEFENDANT
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:002ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF OTILIA MORALES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00FAX FILING BY OTILIA MORALES ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY OTILIA MORALES.
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MTN FOR RELIEF FROM SANCTIONS SET FOR 07/13/16 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER SET FOR 6/16/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 07
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA,.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER SET FOR 10/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 07
Date: August 19, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING BY OTILIA MORALES FILED.
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00MEET & CONFER DECLARATION OF ARTIN BETPERA IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FOR HEARING 07/13/16.
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00HEARING SET 7/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF ARTIN BETPERA IN SU PPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FILED.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00SANCTIONS PAID BY UNITED LAW ONE ATTORNEY FOR OTILIA MORALES IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY WELLS FARGO FOR HEARING 06/16/16.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER AND NTC OF INTENT TO FILE BY OTILIA MORALES FILED
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 10/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07 - RES59725.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION FOR DEMURRER SET FOR 10/13/16 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: September 28, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.
Date: October 25, 2016COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY WELLS FARGO FOR HEARING 10/13/16.
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: November 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.