Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Robert J Colclough Iii, against Donte Smith, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCollection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions335 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1864 days |
Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Declaration of ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS filed
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Declaration of CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST & ATTY FEES filed
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 12/01/15
Date: December 01, 2015Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by CACH LLC
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Declaration of OF VENUE filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.
Date: February 03, 2020Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Riverside) of CACH LLC filed.
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Riverside)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by PLAINTIFF
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY PLAINTIFF
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF VENUE FILED
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: February 03, 2020DECLARATION OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST & ATTY FEES FILED
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY CACH LLC.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00DECLARATION OF ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CACH LLC
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/28/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $770.64 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: February 03, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED.
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY CACH LLC.
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 12/01/15
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: February 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.