Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Dunning Law Firm, against Gabriel Howard, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1231 days |
Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF APPL FOR COURT JUDGMENT CCP 585(D) by FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of COURT Default Judgment (Default ONLY previously entered) filed.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Proposed Judgment submitted by FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA on 04/23/15.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Declaration of OF 1033 LETTER filed
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Default Judgment Review - Western (Non-appearance)
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed 05/26/15
Date: May 26, 2015Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92551-9254.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Riverside)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: June 04, 2015WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: May 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPL FOR COURT JUDGMENT CCP 585(D) BY FIRST NATIONAL BANKOF OMAHA FILED
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 5/19/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF 1033 LETTER FILED
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00SIGNED JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.
Date: May 20, 2015JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 05/26/15
Date: May 26, 2015HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/28/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92551-9254.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS $0.00 FILED
Date: May 15, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.