Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix A.P.C., against Rachel A Giarratano, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions237 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1842 days |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT/ NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 08/25/15
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/28/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $64.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $1,065.18.
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED.
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $139.68 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; MONTEREY COUNTY
Date: November 02, 2016MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED.
Date: January 16, 2020WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: November 02, 2016WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY
Date: January 23, 2017WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: July 28, 2017FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY FILED.
Date: December 05, 2016MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $1,065.18.
Date: January 19, 2017--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $171.59 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: January 19, 2017WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO MONTEREY COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.
Date: June 26, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.