Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blue Moon Marketing Group Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carter & Carter, Aplc, against James Hildebrant, Belinda Hildebrant, represented by Edward R Strelow, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time533 days |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BELINDA HILDEBRANT, JAMES HILDEBRANT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00FAX FILING BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00FAX FILING BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION.
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY BELINDA HILDEBRANT, JAMES HILDEBRANT.
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00FAX FILING BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BELINDA HILDEBRANT, JAMES HILDEBRANT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF ERRATA AND REQUEST FOR CORRECTION ON CLERICAL ERROR
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED; PROPOSED MEDIATOR MJH. MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 04/13/16.
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER C CARTER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF CLERICAL ERROR FILED
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT SUBMITTED BY BELINDA HILDEBRANT.
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00RANDOM MEDIATOR MJH ASSIGNED (BUSINESS) - WESTERN.
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: May 04, 2016RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: April 07, 2016MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 04/13/16.
Date: April 13, 2016RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: May 04, 2016NOTICE OF ERRATA AND REQUEST FOR CORRECTION ON CLERICAL ERROR BY BLUE MOON MARKETINGGROUP INC FILED.
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER C CARTER IN SUPPORT OF CORRECTION FILED
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00--PARTIES STIPULATE TO MJOH (MEDIATOR)--
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00MEDIATORS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OR RECUSAL TO COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY JAMES O HEITING
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.