Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maria Maya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Siamak Vaziri, against Hector Luis, represented by Bonnie R Moss & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with John D. Molloy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time469 days |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED
Date: February 22, 2016JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY HECTOR LUIS.
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY HECTOR LUIS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MARIA MAYA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN D. MOLLOY IN DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARIA MAYA
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: 03/23/16 OSC FILED
Date: April 13, 2016SUMMONS FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY MARIA MAYA.
Date: March 22, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.