We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thelma J Sadler ,
filed a(n)
Petition For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A
case
against
District Attorney ,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
with Jeffrey Prevost presiding.
Filing Date
April 09, 2014
Category
Petition For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A
Last Refreshed
December 16, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
27 days
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Other Parties
Office Of The District Attorney -Riverside (Attorney)
Rim440183 (Case Number Criminal)
Rim440183 (Case Number-criminal Case)
Case Events for
Thelma J Sadler v. District Attorney
Date
Type
Description
May 06, 2020
Hearing
Hearing re: Petition/Motion for Dismissal PC 1203.4/1203.4a (Non Appearance). Complete
May 22, 2014
MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED. Not Applicable
May 22, 2014
MANUAL 8715 SENT TO DOJ. Not Applicable
May 22, 2014
JUS8715A LODGED BY COURT. Not Applicable
May 06, 2014
HEARING RE: PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PC 1203.4/1203.4A (NON APPEARANCE). Completed
May 06, 2014
Docket Event
Order for Dismissal is Granted; Honorable Judge Jeffrey J Prevost (PC 1203.4/1203.4a).
Get Document
May 06, 2014
Docket Event
Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Petition/Motion for Dismissal PC 1203.4/1203.4a (Non Appearance).
Get Document
May 06, 2014
HEARING RE: PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PC 1203.4/1203.4A (NON APPEARANCE) SET 5/06/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 32.
May 06, 2014
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE JEFFREY J. PREVOST (PC 1203.4/1203.4A). Not Applicable
May 05, 2014
CCRPDC HEARING SET FOR 04/28/14 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: 15 DAYS HAS EXPIRED W/NO RESPONSE FROM DAS OFFICE Not Applicable
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.