Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sterling Jewelers Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group A Professional Corporation, against Justin J Lopez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Gordon R. Burkhart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions251 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1947 days |
DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 5/11/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 10.
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/29/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 10.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 09/22/14
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 5/11/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 10 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 9/23/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: April 12, 2017COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES (COLLECTIONS)
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING DECL RE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP1033 FILED
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553-4779.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 5/11/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: October 23, 2014WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: April 19, 2017SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.