Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ocean Blue Financial Inc, filed a(n) Other Complaint - Over $10,000 Does Not Exceed $25,000 case represented by The Perry Law Firm A Professional Corporati, against Agnes Quarshie, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryOther Complaint - Over $10,000 Does Not Exceed $25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time790 days |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings (after judgment) filed by AGNES QUARSHIE
Date: April 30, 2014Notice of Order to Show Cause re: why Dismissal on complaint should not be ordered dismissed.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Default Judgment Review - Western (Non-appearance)
Date: 2014-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC.
Date: April 23, 2014Judgment by Default by Court filed 03/20/14
Date: March 20, 2014Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Over 10,000 filed. Summons Issued.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of OF LARRY M ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF AWARD filed
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Proposed Judgment submitted by OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC on 02/27/14.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 filed
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY CCP 585(d) filed
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint of OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC filed.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED DISMISSED.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 03/20/14
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC.
Date: April 23, 2014HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 2/29/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 3/12/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY CCP 585(D) FILED
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2013 OF OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC FILED.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (AFTER JUDGMENT) FILED BY AGNES QUARSHIE
Date: April 30, 2014DECLARATION OF PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 FILED
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF LARRY M ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF AWARD FILED
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 2/19/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY OCEAN BLUE FINANCIAL INC.
Date: September 04, 2014CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.