Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greg Card, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Other Complaint case represented by In Pro Per, against Tiffany Lynn Stratton, represented by Hartnell Law Group, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Paulette Durand-Barkley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaulette Durand-Barkley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of CARD by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of CARD by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: August 07, 2013System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: August 13, 2013Notice of Ruling re: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT filed
Date: July 11, 2013System Generated Notice re: Clerks Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: August 12, 2013Reply to OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON filed
Date: 2013-04-18T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of CARD by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Opposition to DEMURRER by GREG CARD filed
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint of CARD by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON represented by GEORGE S THEIOS filed.
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Proposed Order re: DEMURRER for hearing on 04/26/13 submitted by TIFFANY LYNN STRATTON.
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92320.
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Summons on Complaint of CARD filed
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Verification of COMPLAINT filed by GREG CARD.
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.